Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dowdell, Colette, Dowdell, Rodger, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Frawley, Esq., Timothy Patrick, against Long Built Homes, Inc., Long, Robert F., in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 01, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT of dismissal with no request for hearing, pursuant to G.L. c. 212 § 3A(b). | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | One Trial entry of dismissal nisi G.L. c. 212 § 3A(b) | |
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event | FINDINGS OF FACT pursuant to G.L. c. 212, § 3A: The Court finds that Plaintiff's total damages are not likely to exceed $25,000.00. | |
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to AG of complaint on chapter 93A Sent On: 12/04/2015 08:39:37 | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Timothy Patrick Frawley, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Rodger Dowdell | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/01/2015 | |
December 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Timothy Patrick Frawley, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Colette Dowdell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.