Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Neto, Carla, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Delamere, Esq., Stephen J, against Amin, Shasta, John Doe Corp., John Doe, Inc., John Doe, Llc, Khan, Misal, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2015 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Canceled Reason: Case Disposed | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Reconsider (#15.0): ALLOWED After hearing, the defendants having failed to appear, counsel is allowed to withdraw. | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Remove Default Pursuant to MRCP Rule 55 (c) (#12.0): Other action taken The court's previous ORDER dated 12/14/16, allowing the defendants motion to remove default is VACATED. The defendants remain in default. The matter shall be marked up for a hearing an assessment of damages notice to be sent out directly to the defendants. | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John Thomas Murray, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Shasta Amin doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John Thomas Murray, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Limited Appearance Counsel for Defendant Shahid Raza doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John Thomas Murray, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Limited Appearance Counsel for Defendant Zubair Raza doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John Thomas Murray, Esq. dismissed/withdrawn as Limited Appearance Counsel for Defendant Misal Khan doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Event Result: The following event: Motion Hearing for Reconsideration scheduled for 06/16/2017 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled Appeared: Attorney Murray, Esq., John Thomas Staff Appeared: Court Reporter Pallatroni, Kathy | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Defendant Misal Khan doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco, Zubair Raza doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco, Shahid Raza doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco, Shasta Amin doing business as Stop N Save Discount Tobacco in support of (Supplemental) Motion to Reconsider. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.