Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pimentel, Brian, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carvelli, Esq., Peter A, against Champion'S Sports Center, Inc., represented by Farrey, Iii, Esq., Thomas B, Mccarron, Esq., Kate Elizabeth, Seliger, Esq., Brooke, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2014 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Received from Defendant Champion's Sports Center, Inc.: Answer to amended complaint;
Date: April 13, 2015Amended: original complaint filed by Brian Pimentel
Date: April 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs as to Brian Pimentel's original complaint | |
April 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Champion's Sports Center, Inc.: Answer to amended complaint; | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended: original complaint filed by Brian Pimentel | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint MRCP 12(b) (#8.0): DENIED without prejudice in that the motion goes beyond the four corners of the complaint and would be required to be converted to a motion under Rule 56. The plaintiff's deposition and any limited discovery relating to the release and the alleged defect would be appropriate prior to the filing of a Rule 56 Motion. If the plaintiff in, good faith, believes that a claim for gross negligence can be asserted he is granted 21 days to file an amended complaint. | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Matter taken under advisement The following event: Rule 12 Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2015 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held - Under advisement Appeared: Attorney McCarron, Esq., Kate Elizabeth Attorney Carvelli, Esq., Peter A. | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance entered On this date Kate Elizabeth McCarron, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Champion's Sports Center, Inc. | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Farrey, III, Esq., Thomas B (Attorney) on behalf of Champion's Sports Center, Inc. (Defendant) | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed Applies To: Champion's Sports Center, Inc. (Defendant) | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Pimentel's Memorandum in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Opposition to paper #8.0 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Brian Pimentel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.