Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcelroy Metal Mill, Inc. D B A, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wecker, Esq., Ross C, against Delsa Enterprises D B A, Jlm Raynham Associates, Llc, People, Inc., New England Commercial Builders, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2013 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL re: New England Commercial Builders, Inc.; service not complete by deadline. | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Partial Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) as to People, Inc., JLM Raynham Associates, LLC, and Delsa Enterprise, d/b/a Raynham Flea Market with prejudice. | |
July 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ONE TRIAL review by Clerk, case to remain in Superior Court (Erin J. Tierney, Assistant Clerk Magistrate) | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion (P#2) ALLOWED (Philip F. Leddy, First Assistant Clerk Magistrate) Notices mailed 7/1/2013. | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Plaintiff McElroy Metal Mill, Inc.'s MOTION for appointment of special process server QUICKSERV, INC. | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type A02, Track F. | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.