Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Fregault, Esq., Garrett R., against One 1988 Gmc Pickup Truck, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2006 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Transcript of proceedings, Volume I, dated February 7, 2006, received from Court Reporter, Cindy L. Lamberta (03-1164 #11) | |
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event | ORDER AND JUDGMENT: ...Wherefore, it is hereby ORDERED that all right, title and interest in the One 1988 GMC Pickup Truck bearing VIN2GTCC114K9J1500489 shall be forfeited to the Commonwealth of Massachusetts and shall be distributed by the District Attonrey for the Bristol District in accordance with M.G.L. c 94C, sect. 47(d) and be assigned to the Swansea Police Department for official use. (Richard J. Chin, Justice) | |
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's MOTION for judgment of default against Luis Coelho; Affidavit of Notice. | |
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | After hearing motion for one week leave to (allowed 2-14-06) to file affidavit of notice. Default to issue after the filing of a return of service. (Richard Chin, Justice) JFL | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice ORDER issued, hereon returnable at the Taunton Superior Court on February 07, 2006 to show cause why Preliminary Order to Secure and Hold, (John F. Losowski, Jr. Asst. Clerk/Magistrate) | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Support of The Commonwealth's Motion for a Preliminary Order to Secure and Hold | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Commonwealth of Massachusetts's ex parte MOTION for a Preliminary Order to Secure and Hold | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type E95, Track F. | |
December 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Commonwealth of Massachusetts pursuant to M G L c 94C, Sec. 47 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.