Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Acushnet Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fergus, Esq., Katherine Young, against Cacey, Dorothy, Cacey, Jr., William C., Highlander Custom Golf, Inc., represented by Perkins, Esq., Matthew W, Emanuelson, Esq., Roger A, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2006 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs. All parties waive rights of appeal. | |
October 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 12/4/2006 | |
January 25, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER (First Amended Complaint): Highlander Custom Golf, Inc., William C. Cacey, Jr., Dorothy Cacey | |
January 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Amended complaint of Acushnet Company | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Origin 1, Type A02, Track F. | |
December 22, 2005 | Docket Event | Complaint & civil action cover sheet filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.