Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Melissa Garcia, General Guardian Of Miranda Cabeceiras, Ppa, filed a(n) Torts case represented by Rego, Esq., Goncalo M, Abreu, Esq., Christopher M, against Silver City Galleria, Llc, General Growth Properties, Inc., Ctm Group, Inc., represented by Seliger, Esq., Brooke, Farrey, Iii, Esq., Thomas B, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2006 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT (33a) for defendants CTM Group, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Silver City Galleria, LLC with costs. (Richard T. Moses, Justice). Copies mailed 8/24/2006 | |
August 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Application (33a) of Defendant, CTM Group, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Silver City Galleria, LLC v. Plaintiff, Melissa Garcia, General Guardian of Miranda Cabeceiras, ppa for Final Judgment and affidavit. | |
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event | CTM Group, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Silver City Galleria, LLC's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G (return receipt attached) | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Application of CTM Group, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Silver City Galleria, LLC for Miranda Cabeceiras, ppa's hospital records from St. Anne's Hospital and Charlton Memorial Hospital | |
May 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Application of General Growth Properties, Inc. for Melissa Garcia, General Guardian of Miranda Cabeceiras, ppa's hospital records from Children's Hospital | |
April 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Application of CTM Group, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Silver City Galleria, LLC for Miranda Cabeceiras, ppa's hospital records from Morton Hospital and Medical Center | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | ANSWER: CTM Group, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Silver City Galleria, LLC | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Atty Thomas B Farrey III, Brooke P Seliger's notice of appearance for CTM Group, Inc., General Growth Properties, Inc., Silver City Galleria, LLC | |
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): Silver City Galleria, LLC, service made on March 17, 2006 (agent in charge service) Harold McDougall | |
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (summons): General Growth Properties, Inc., service made on March 17, 2006 (agent in charge service) Frank Collazo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.