Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Raymond Laurie, Exc. Of Janice Laurie, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Mulligan, Esq., Edward John, against Mcagreavey, Kathleen, Shelton, George, Adair, William, Chamber Of Commerce Of The Attleboros, Attleboro Area Industrial Museum, Inc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with David A. McLaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. McLaughlin Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2009 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs, and all rights of appeal waived | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 6/19/2009 (David A. McLaughlin, Justice) | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Raymond Laurie, Exc. of Janice Laurie's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G. (copy of green card attached) | |
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Raymond Laurie, Exc. of Janice Laurie's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer medical bills as evidence, pursuant to MGLc 233, sec 79G. (copy of green card attached) | |
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Partial Stipulation of Dismissal (With Prejudice) {as to Attleboro Area Industrial Museum, Inc., William Adair, George Shelton and Kathleen McAgreavey ONLY. | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Deft's. Affidavit of Notice in Accordance with the Provisions of MGL c 233, sec 79G | |
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED Notice sent to appear for trial by jury on 5/26/2009 | |
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for trial by jury on 5/5/2009 | |
January 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion (P#14) ALLOWED (David A. McLaughlin, Justice) Notices mailed 1/14/2009 | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | ASSENTED to MOTION of the Defendant, Attleboro Area Industrial Museum, Inc., for a Trial Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.