Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
E & A Realty Trust, E.G. Foods, Inc., Fidelity & Guaranty Ins. Underwriters, Inc. T A St. Paul Ins., filed a(n) Torts case represented by Loftus, Iii, Esq., Patrick J, against Delfield Company, represented by Lynch, Esq., Francis M, in the jurisdiction of Bristol County, MA, . Bristol County, MA Superior Courts with E. Susan Garsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeE. Susan Garsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2006 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBristol County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice, without costs including any and all claims, third party claims and all rights of appeal. | |
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Nisi dismissal; agreement or stipulation to be filed by 8/21/2009 (Richard T. Moses, Justice) | |
May 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for Rule 16 Conference on 7/27/09. | |
February 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Atty Matthew M. Lyons's Withdrawal of Appearance filed re: Copeland Corporation, LLC. | |
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint motion #25: to extend discovery deadline, after review, although this appears to be the eighth amendment to the original tracking order, in view of the filing of a third party complaint around one year ago, and in view of the scheduled view of the alleged defective refrigerator later this month and perceived necessary discovery thereafter, the request is deemed reasonable. Amended tracking order to issue extending the discovery deadline through February 24, 2009. Philip F. Leddy, Magistrate | |
August 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Defendant Copeland Corporation, LLC.'s joint MOTION to extend discovery deadline | |
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (P#24) Joint Motion to Reassign Tracking Order: Allowed Mark A. Ferriera. Notices mailed 1/29/2008 | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Joint Motion to Reassign Tracking Order | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear for pre-trial conference on 2/25/2008 | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | ANSWER by (3d pty def): Copeland Corporation, LLC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.