Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
National Lumber Company Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barnett, Esq., Mark Edward, against Berkshire Property Rentals Llc, Martin, Timothy, represented by Martin, Esq., Ryan Patrick, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 08, 2022Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to National Lumber Company LLC Doing Business as National Building Products, Timothy Martin, Berkshire Property Rentals LLC's original complaint FILED Applies To: National Lumber Company LLC Doing Business as National Building Products (Plaintiff); Martin, Timothy (Defendant); Berkshire Property Rentals LLC (Defendant); Barnett, Esq., Mark Edward (Attorney) on behalf of National Lumber Company LLC Doing Business as National Building Products (Plaintiff); Pro Se (Attorney) on behalf of Martin, Timothy (Defendant); Martin, Esq., Ryan Patrick (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Property Rentals LLC (Defendant) | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to original complaint. Defendant Timothy Martin (Pro Se) Answer and Special Defenses to Complaint with Demand for Trial by Jury. With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Martin, Timothy (Defendant) | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Berkshire Property Rentals LLC: Service made at last and usual; place of abode of Berkshire Property Rentals LLC at 38 Glendale Road Stockbridge, MA 01262, and by mailing 1st class to the same address a true and attested copy of the Summons & Complaint on 9/19/2022 at 12:14pm. FILED Applies To: Berkshire Property Rentals LLC (Defendant) | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Berkshire Property Rentals LLC: Answer with claim for trial by jury; With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Berkshire Property Rentals LLC (Defendant); Martin, Esq., Ryan Patrick (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Property Rentals LLC (Defendant) | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Martin, Timothy: Service made at last and usual; place of abode of Timothy Martin at 38A Glendale Road Stockbridge, MA 01262 and by mailing 1st class to the same address a true and attested copy of the Summons & Complaint on 9/19/2022 at 12:14pm. FILED | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Ryan Patrick Martin, Esq. added for Defendant Berkshire Property Rentals LLC. FILED Applies To: Berkshire Property Rentals LLC (Defendant); Martin, Esq., Ryan Patrick (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Property Rentals LLC (Defendant) | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Pro Se added as Self Represented for Defendant Timothy Martin Applies To: Martin, Timothy (Defendant) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed. | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/08/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.