Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association As, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Berger, Esq., Ashley M, Loeb, Esq., Jeffrey B, against Allesio, Michael, Allessio As, Michael A, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 07, 2022Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 22, 2022Original civil complaint filed.
Date: August 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5's Motion for AMENDED Motion for Default Judgment with proposed Judgment, FILED. (JUDGMENT CORRECTED TO REFLECT CORRECT PAGE NO.) ENTERED (Agostini, J). | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for default judgment, FILED. (#8.0): ALLOWED Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Loeb, Esq., Jeffrey B (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff); Berger, Esq., Ashley M (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant, Michael A. Allessio, as Trustee of the Allessio Nominee Trust, FILED. Applies To: Loeb, Esq., Jeffrey B (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff); Berger, Esq., Ashley M (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff) | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Plaintiff, Attorney: Jeffrey B Loeb, Esq. Rich May, PC 176 Federal St, Boston, MA 02110 Plaintiff, Attorney: Ashley M Berger, Esq. Rich May, P.C. 176 Federal St 6th Floor, Boston, MA 02110 Defendant: Michael A Allessio as No addresses available | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Document: A Default order Mass. R. Civ. P. 55(a) was generated and sent to: Defendant: Michael A Allessio as No addresses available | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Entered as to: Defendant Michael A Allessio as Trustee of The Allessio Nominee Trust: Defaulted by 55(a) request; ENTERED | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5's Request for Default Pursuant to Rule 55(a) as to Defendant Michael A. Allesio, as Trustee of the Allessio Nominee Trust FILED Applies To: Loeb, Esq., Jeffrey B (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff); Berger, Esq., Ashley M (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff) | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Michael A Allessio as Trustee of The Allessio Nominee Trust: Service via certified mail; on September 8, 2022 a Summons and one copy of each of the following were served: Summons, First Amended Complaint, and Civil Tracking Order. With an exhibit of a copy of the return receipt card. FILED Applies To: Michael A Allessio as Trustee of The Allessio Nominee Trust (Defendant) | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended: First amended complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 with Exhibits A, B, and C FILED Applies To: Loeb, Esq., Jeffrey B (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff); Berger, Esq., Ashley M (Attorney) on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank National Association as Trustee for Option One Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-5 Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2005-5 (Plaintiff) | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.