Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F K A Hampden Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hamel, Esq., Thomas J, Moffat, Esq., Jonathan J, against 176 Shoemaker Lane Llc, Lewis, Santana, Oms Hospitality Group Inc, Sparks, Mark W., represented by Kenefick, Iii, Esq., Thomas Aquinas, Mcauliffe, Esq., John Michael, Wilson, Esq., Seth Megathlin, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with Douglas H. Wilkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H. Wilkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 18, 2022Complaint electronically filed.
Date: August 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 09/22/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Canceled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding in light of the Judge's Approval of the Stipulation of the parties as to the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Hearing on Preliminary injunction scheduled for September 22, 2022 is no longer necessary. Please Remove from List RECEIVED ORIGINAL request to cancel received 9/22/2022. Applies To: Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff) | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of the Parties as to the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. FILED Applies To: Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff); McAuliffe, Esq., John Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Lewis, Santana (Defendant); Wilson, Esq., Seth Megathlin (Attorney) on behalf of Sparks, Mark W. (Defendant); Kenefick, III, Esq., Thomas Aquinas (Attorney) on behalf of OMS Hospitality Group Inc (Defendant); Moffat, Esq., Jonathan J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff) | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear on Preliminary Injunction on 09/22/22 at 2:00 p.m. ZOOM SESSION -- Short Order of Notice Returnable Sent On: 09/06/2022 14:03:33 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing on Preliminary Injunction scheduled on: 09/06/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Request of Plaintiff Hon. Douglas H Wilkins, Presiding
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Thomas Aquinas Kenefick, III, Esq. added for Defendant OMS Hospitality Group Inc. FILED Applies To: OMS Hospitality Group Inc (Defendant) | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction from September 6, 2022 to September 13, 2022. (#10.0): ALLOWED Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H Applies To: Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff); Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff); Moffat, Esq., Jonathan J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff)
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed. Notice of Appearance of Attorney Seth M. Wilson for Defendant Marc W. Sparks. FILED Applies To: Sparks, Mark W. (Defendant); Wilson, Esq., Seth Megathlin (Attorney) on behalf of Sparks, Mark W. (Defendant) | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date John Michael McAuliffe, Esq. added for Defendant Santana Lewis | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank's Motion to Reschedule Hearing on Preliminary Injunction09/06/2022 02:00 PM Hearing on Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's motion to continue Hearing on Preliminary Injunction from September 6, 2022 to September 13, 2022. FILED Applies To: Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff); Hamel, Esq., Thomas J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff); Moffat, Esq., Jonathan J (Attorney) on behalf of Berkshire Bank, Successor By Merger F/K/A Hampden Bank (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.