Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Phelps-Smith, Rebecca, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Christensen, Esq., Kyle Gray, Howard, Esq., Gregory, against Wojtkowski, Conrad, Wojtkowski, Erik, Wojtkowski, Frances, represented by Martin, Esq., William E, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 12/18/2023 at 2:00pm via ZOOM Sent On: 02/17/2023 09:21:26 | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER: on Plaintiff's Motion for Attachment of Real Property entered-motion DENIED (Agostini, J.) Copies certified to counsel Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Martin, Esq., William E (Attorney) on behalf of Wojtkowski, Conrad (Defendant); Howard, Esq., Gregory (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff); Christensen, Esq., Kyle Gray (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Real Estate Attachment scheduled on: 10/06/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled via Zoom - Attorney Christensen and Attorney Martin present via Zoom - after hearing for real estate attachment, matter taken under advisement (Agostini, J.) Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Hearing on Real Estate Attachment 10/06/21 at 10:00 a.m. ZOOM Sent On: 10/01/2021 13:13:51 Notice Sent To: Gregory Howard, Esq. Donovan O'Connor and Dodig, LLP 1330 Mass Moca Way, North Adams, MA 01247 Notice Sent To: Kyle Gray Christensen, Esq. Donovan O'Connor and Dodig, LLP 1330 Mass MoCA Way, North Adams, MA 01247 Notice Sent To: William E Martin, Esq. Martin and Olivera, LLP 75 South Church St Suite 550, Pittsfield, MA 01201 | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. 1. Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Issuance for Issuance of Real Estate Attachment of Property of Conrad Wojtkowski, Frances Wojtkowski, and Erik Wojtkowski; 2. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Real Estate Attachment of Property of Conrad Wojtkowski, Frances Wojtkowski, and Erik Wojtkowski; 3. Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Real Estate Property of Conrad Wojtkowski, Frances Wojtkowski, and Erik Wojtkowski; 4. Affidavit of Compliance; 5. Plaintiff's 9C Certification; and 6. List of Documents. FILED. Applies To: Christensen, Esq., Kyle Gray (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C FILED Applies To: Christensen, Esq., Kyle Gray (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A FILED. Applies To: Christensen, Esq., Kyle Gray (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing FILED Applies To: Christensen, Esq., Kyle Gray (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to to Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Real Estate Attachment. filed by Conrad Wojtkowski, Frances Wojtkowski, Erik Wojtkowski FILED Applies To: Martin, Esq., William E (Attorney) on behalf of Wojtkowski, Conrad, Wojtkowski, Erik, Wojtkowski, Frances (Defendant) | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Gregory Howard, Esq., Kyle Gray Christensen, Esq.'s Memorandum in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Real Estate Attachment of Property of Conrad Wojtkowski, Frances Wojtkowski, and Erik Wojtkowski. FILED. Applies To: Howard, Esq., Gregory (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff); Christensen, Esq., Kyle Gray (Attorney) on behalf of Rebecca Phelps-Smith Personal Representative for the Estate of Jason Berthiaume (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.