Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lee Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Graziano, Esq., John W, against Kilgore, Kevin K, Kilgore, Sandra K, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with Douglas H. Wilkins presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H. Wilkins Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of voluntary dismissal (41a.l.i) FILED Applies To: Graziano, Esq., John W (Attorney) on behalf of Lee Bank (Plaintiff) | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER of notice by publication of foreclosure in Berkshire Eagle New Order of Notice issued and returnable 10/20/2021. After speaking with Attorney Graziano's office, return date requested 10/20/2021. Applies To: Graziano, Esq., John W (Attorney) on behalf of Lee Bank (Plaintiff) | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to extend return date, FILED. (#5.0): ALLOWED Judge: Wilkins, Hon. Douglas H Applies To: Graziano, Esq., John W (Attorney) on behalf of Lee Bank (Plaintiff)
Judge: Wilkins, Douglas H |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Lee Bank's Motion to extend return date to 10/04/2021 (original and new Order of Notice submitted), FILED. Applies To: Graziano, Esq., John W (Attorney) on behalf of Lee Bank (Plaintiff) | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER of notice by publication of foreclosure in Berkshire Eagle Original Order of Notice issued and returnable 08/17/2021. Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit that Defendant Kevin K Kilgore, Sandra K Kilgore is not in the Military FILED. Applies To: Graziano, Esq., John W (Attorney) on behalf of Lee Bank (Plaintiff) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Mortgagee's Affidavit FILED. Applies To: Graziano, Esq., John W (Attorney) on behalf of Lee Bank (Plaintiff) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track X - Accelerated was added on 06/17/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.