Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ciaburri, Diane, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A, against Olds, Kristle, represented by Russell, Esq., Julie Bednarz, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: December 03, 2020Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: December 03, 2020Received from Defendant Olds, Kristle: Answer with claim for trial by jury;
Date: April 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice and without interest or costs, waiving all rights of appeal. FILED Applies To: Russell, Esq., Julie Bednarz (Attorney) on behalf of Olds, Kristle (Defendant); Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Ciaburri, Diane (Plaintiff) | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Diane Ciaburri's Request for Stipulation of Dismissal received by the court not be docketed at this time. FILED Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Ciaburri, Diane (Plaintiff) | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Olds, Kristle: Answer with claim for trial by jury; | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Julie Bednarz Russell, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Kristle Olds | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Olds, Kristle: Service made at last and usual on 244 Holmes Road, Pittsfield, MA 01201 on 04/16/21 at 10:25 a.m. | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 5/31/22 at 2:00 p.m. Sent On: 02/09/2021 09:41:40 Notice Sent To: Cynthia A Spinola, Esq. Hashim & Spinola 82 Wendell Ave, Pittsfield, MA 01201 Notice Sent To: Kristle Olds No addresses available | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to amend tracking order 60 Days until beginning of May 3, 2021 for service of process. Proposed tracking deadlines: Service filed by 05/03/2021; response to complaint 06/03/2021; motions under MRCP 12, 19 and 20 served by 06/03/2021, filed by 07/06/2021; all motions under MRCP 15 served by 06/03/2021, filed by 07/06/2021; discovery 11/29/2021; all motions under MRCP 56 filed by 01/31/2022; Final Pre-Trial Conference 05/28/2022, with proposed tracking order (#3.0): ALLOWED (Agostini, J.) ALLOWED AMENDED TRACKING ORDER ISSUED Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Ciaburri, Diane (Plaintiff) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit filed by Plaintiff Diane Ciaburri in support of plaintiff's motion to amend tracking order, FILED. (FAX) Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Ciaburri, Diane (Plaintiff) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Diane Ciaburri's Motion to amend tracking order 60 Days until beginning of May 3, 2021 for service of process. Proposed tracking deadlines: Service filed by 05/03/2021; response to complaint 06/03/2021; motions under MRCP 12, 19 and 20 served by 06/03/2021, filed by 07/06/2021; all motions under MRCP 15 served by 06/03/2021, filed by 07/06/2021; discovery 11/29/2021; all motions under MRCP 56 filed by 01/31/2022; Final Pre-Trial Conference 05/28/2022, with proposed tracking order, FILED. FAX Applies To: Spinola, Esq., Cynthia A (Attorney) on behalf of Ciaburri, Diane (Plaintiff) | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.