Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Benson, Bruce, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Quigley, Esq., Elizabeth, against Division Of Insurance Board Of Appeals, represented by Batchelor, Esq., Andrew Martin, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2019 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT on the Pleadings entered: After hearing and consideration thereof; the decision of the defendant, Commonwealth of Massachusetts Board of Appeals on Motor Vehicle Liability Policies and Bonds is AFFIRMED (Agostini, J) It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Benson, Bruce (Plaintiff); Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: on Cross-Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings, ENTERED (Agostini, J). Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Quigley, Esq., Elizabeth (Attorney) on behalf of Benson, Bruce (Plaintiff); Batchelor, Esq., Andrew Martin (Attorney) on behalf of Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Hearing for Judgment on Pleading scheduled on: 03/29/2021 11:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled via Zoom - Attorney Zepka and the Plaintiff, Bruce Benson, present via Zoom - Attorney Batchelor present via Zoom - Case on for Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Defendant's Cross Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - after hearing, matter taken under advisement (Agostini, J.) Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear 03/29/2021 at 11:00 a.m. for Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Defendant's Cross Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings -- ZOOM SESSION Sent On: 03/08/2021 12:14:39 Notice Sent To: Elizabeth Quigley, Esq. Law Office Of Elizabeth J. Quigley 27 Henry Ave, Pittsfield, MA 01201 Notice Sent To: Andrew Martin Batchelor, Esq. Office of the Attorney General 1441 Main St Suite 1200, Springfield, MA 01103 | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Division of Insurance Board of Appeals's Cross Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and OPPOSITION to the Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, FILED. Applies To: Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant); Batchelor, Esq., Andrew Martin (Attorney) on behalf of Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Bruce Benson's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with Affidavit of Bruce Bensen, FILED. Applies To: Quigley, Esq., Elizabeth (Attorney) on behalf of Benson, Bruce (Plaintiff) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Elizabeth Quigley, Esq.Bruce Benson's Memorandum in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, FILED. Applies To: Quigley, Esq., Elizabeth (Attorney) on behalf of Benson, Bruce (Plaintiff) | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED In hand service to Renee Stuart, Admin Assistant on 10/24/19 at 2:30 p.m. Applies To: Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant) | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to impound, filed. (#5.0): ALLOWED Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Batchelor, Esq., Andrew Martin (Attorney) on behalf of Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Administrative record filed: (Redacted) Applies To: Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant); Batchelor, Esq., Andrew Martin (Attorney) on behalf of Division of Insurance Board of Appeals (Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.