Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Adams, Holly J, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Flournoy, Esq., Lee Diane, against Connors, Michael S, Interprint, Inc., Morin, Roland M, represented by Fabbo, Esq., Marylou Varao, Flores, Esq., Erica E, James, Esq., Maureen E, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with Agostini, John A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAgostini, John A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 10, 2018 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Holly J Adams, Interprint, Inc., Roland M Morin, Michael S Connors's original complaint FILED. Applies To: Flournoy, Esq., Lee Diane (Attorney) on behalf of Adams, Holly J (Plaintiff); Fabbo, Esq., Marylou Varao (Attorney) on behalf of Connors, Michael S, Interprint, Inc., Morin, Roland M (Defendant); James, Esq., Maureen E (Attorney) on behalf of Interprint, Inc., Morin, Roland M (Defendant); Flores, Esq., Erica E (Attorney) on behalf of Connors, Michael S, Interprint, Inc., Morin, Roland M (Defendant) | |
June 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Lee Diane Flournoy, Esq. Attorney: Marylou Varao Fabbo, Esq. Attorney: Maureen E James, Esq. Attorney: Erica E Flores, Esq. Attorney: Marylou Varao Fabbo, Esq. Attorney: Maureen E James, Esq. Attorney: Erica E Flores, Esq. Attorney: Marylou Varao Fabbo, Esq. Attorney: Erica E Flores, Esq. | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Document: A Order for Entry of Dismissal Nisi was generated and sent to: Attorney: Lee Diane Flournoy, Esq. Attorney: Marylou Varao Fabbo, Esq. Attorney: Maureen E James, Esq. Attorney: Erica E Flores, Esq. Attorney: Marylou Varao Fabbo, Esq. Attorney: Maureen E James, Esq. Attorney: Erica E Flores, Esq. Attorney: Marylou Varao Fabbo, Esq. Attorney: Erica E Flores, Esq. | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER of dismissal nisi entered after action was reported settled; Agreement or Stipulation shall be filed in this court by 06/18/2020 Judge: Hogan, Hon. Maureen Applies To: Flournoy, Esq., Lee Diane (Attorney) on behalf of Adams, Holly J (Plaintiff); Fabbo, Esq., Marylou Varao (Attorney) on behalf of Interprint, Inc. (Defendant)
Judge: Hogan, Maureen |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Letter from Atty. Fabbo indicating that the case has settled and requesting a 30 day order of dismissal Applies To: Fabbo, Esq., Marylou Varao (Attorney) on behalf of Interprint, Inc. (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference 06/10/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Sent On: 01/29/2020 15:56:14 | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 05/07/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to amend the tracking order, filed. (#32.0): ALLOWED Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Flournoy, Esq., Lee Diane (Attorney) on behalf of Adams, Holly J (Plaintiff); Fabbo, Esq., Marylou Varao (Attorney) on behalf of Connors, Michael S, Interprint, Inc., Morin, Roland M (Defendant); James, Esq., Maureen E (Attorney) on behalf of Interprint, Inc., Morin, Roland M (Defendant); Flores, Esq., Erica E (Attorney) on behalf of Connors, Michael S, Interprint, Inc., Morin, Roland M (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant Holly J Adams, Interprint, Inc., Roland M Morin's Joint Motion to extend the tracking order Rule 56 served by 03/31/2020; Rule 56 filed by 04/30/2020; Final pre trial conference from 05/07/2020, filed. | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 05/07/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Sent On: 10/15/2019 14:03:28 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.