Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Adams Community Bank, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Ferris, Esq., Kenneth P, against Citibank Federal Savings Bank, Wiehl, Nancy J, Wiehl, Steven T, represented by Pro Se, Swisher, Esq., Meredith Ann, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT for Plaintiff, Defendant(s), Adams Community Bank, Citibank Federal Savings Bank against Defendant(s), Steven T Wiehl, Nancy J Wiehl, without statutory costs.It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED: 1. That $1,373.27 of the surplus funds be paid to Hashim & Spinola for fees and expenses incurred in connection with this Interpleader action; 2. That $43,541.02 of the surplus funds be paid to Citibank, NA, successor to Citibank, Federal Savings Bank to be applied to a Note given by the Defendants Steven T. Wiehl and Nancy J Wiehl that was secured by a mortgage loan on the said defendants' real estate located at 249 Mountain Drive, Pittsfield, Massachusetts (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Swisher, Esq., Meredith Ann (Attorney) on behalf of Citibank Federal Savings Bank (Defendant); Ferris, Esq., Kenneth P (Attorney) on behalf of Adams Community Bank (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for summary judgment (joint motion) (#15.0): ALLOWED (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Wiehl, Steven T (Defendant); Wiehl, Nancy J (Defendant); Swisher, Esq., Meredith Ann (Attorney) on behalf of Citibank Federal Savings Bank (Defendant); Ferris, Esq., Kenneth P (Attorney) on behalf of Adams Community Bank (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Adams Community Bank's Joint Motion for leave to enter Summary Judgment pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 56 filed. Applies To: Adams Community Bank (Plaintiff); Wiehl, Steven T (Defendant); Wiehl, Nancy J (Defendant); Citibank Federal Savings Bank (Defendant) | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing and list of documents filed. Applies To: Ferris, Esq., Kenneth P (Attorney) on behalf of Adams Community Bank (Plaintiff) | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A filed. Applies To: Ferris, Esq., Kenneth P (Attorney) on behalf of Adams Community Bank (Plaintiff) | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of CitiBank, NA filed. Applies To: Citibank Federal Savings Bank (Defendant) | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Atty. Kenneth P. Ferris filed. Applies To: Ferris, Esq., Kenneth P (Attorney) on behalf of Adams Community Bank (Plaintiff) | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 4/8/19 at 2:00 PM Sent On: 12/18/2018 10:00:58 Applies To: Wiehl, Steven T (Defendant); Wiehl, Nancy J (Defendant); Swisher, Esq., Meredith Ann (Attorney) on behalf of Citibank Federal Savings Bank (Defendant); Ferris, Esq., Kenneth P (Attorney) on behalf of Adams Community Bank (Plaintiff) | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 04/09/2019 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Court Order Hon. Daniel Ford, Presiding Appeared: Staff:
Judge: Ford, Daniel |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 04/09/2019 at 2:00 p.m. Sent On: 11/27/2018 11:00:09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.