Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lin, Qing Zhuang, Zheng, Xiao Fang, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fuster, Esq., Robert Michael, Zepka, Esq., Jonathan Thomas, against Co-Act, Inc., represented by Siegars, Esq., Mark W, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with Ford, Daniel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFord, Daniel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Qing Zhuang Lin, Xiao Fang Zheng, Co-Act, Inc.'s original complaint | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 10/23/2018 at 2:00 p.m. Sent On: 07/20/2018 09:33:48 | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 07/25/2018 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint Request of Parties Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding Appeared: Staff: Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A
Judge: Agostini, JohnAgostini, John A |
|
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to continue Final Pre-Trial Conference from 07/25/2018 to October, 2018 and to extend discovery to September 25, 2018 (#11.0): ALLOWED Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Siegars, Esq., Mark W (Attorney) on behalf of Co-Act, Inc. (Defendant); Fuster, Esq., Robert Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Lin, Qing Zhuang, Zheng, Xiao Fang (Plaintiff); Zepka, Esq., Jonathan Thomas (Attorney) on behalf of Lin, Qing Zhuang, Zheng, Xiao Fang (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Qing Zhuang Lin, Xiao Fang Zheng's Assented to Motion to continue Final Pre-Trial Conference from 07/25/2018 to October, 2018 and to extend discovery deadline to September 25, 2018, filed. Applies To: Fuster, Esq., Robert Michael (Attorney) on behalf of Lin, Qing Zhuang, Zheng, Xiao Fang (Plaintiff); Zepka, Esq., Jonathan Thomas (Attorney) on behalf of Lin, Qing Zhuang, Zheng, Xiao Fang (Plaintiff) | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 07/25/2018 at 2:00 p.m. Sent On: 04/20/2018 10:45:19 | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Ford, Hon. Daniel The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 04/19/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled -- Counsel reports that mediation is scheduled for 05/30/2018 -- Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 07/25/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Ford, J). Judge: Ford, Hon. Daniel
Judge: Ford, Daniel |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for status conference on 4/19 at 2:00 PM Sent On: 02/26/2018 09:25:45 | |
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 02/23/2018 16:01:23 | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A The following event: Conference to Review Status scheduled for 02/22/2018 02:00 PM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled-Attys' Zepka and Siegars present; counsel have made an application for mediation to Berkshire Housing; are awaiting it to be scheduled; further status scheduled for 4/19 at 2:00 PM Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A
Judge: Agostini, John A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.