Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tubbs, Laura, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Howard, Esq., Gregory, against Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Winters, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2017 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation of dismissal without Prejudice as to Laura Tubbs's original complaint Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A
Judge: Agostini, John |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company: Service made in hand; on 12/26/2017 at 8:26 a.m. to Al Hood, Manager at 62 Everett Street, Westwood MA 02090, filed. | |
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Winters, Ronald: Service made at last and usual; on 12/19/2017 at 11:59 p.m. 9 Marshall Avenue, Adams MA 01220, filed. | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Demand for jury trial entered. Judge: Ford, Hon. Daniel
Judge: Ford, Daniel |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil action cover sheet filed. Judge: Ford, Hon. Daniel
Judge: Ford, Daniel |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original civil complaint filed. Judge: Ford, Hon. Daniel Judge: Ford, Hon. Daniel
Judge: Ford, Daniel |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/06/2017 | |
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Gregory Howard, Esq. added for Plaintiff Laura Tubbs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.