Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rothermel, Albin S., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Fairfield, David, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts with John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A. Agostini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2010 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Original execution issued by mail to Albin S. Rothermel on 10/3/11 | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#11)-Allowed, (John A. Agostini). Notices mailed on 10/3/11 | |
September 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's motion to establish issuance (Writ) of execution, filed | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Default judgmnt (55b2) by court v defendant(s) David Fairfield in amount of $53,186.00 plus interest from 12/15/2010 in the sum of $4,388.98, and costs in the amount of $323.58, entered, (Daniel A. Ford), Copies mailed 8/23/2011 | |
August 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#5) -After hearing-court finds defendant practicing unfair and deceptive act by accepting deposit and using to serve his own personal use and failing to make any attempts to fulfill contract, defendant found to be in 93A violation-Court awards double damages in the sum of $53,186.00 plus costs in the amount of $323.58, (Daniel A. Ford). Notices mailed to parties. | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice sent to appear on 8/23/2011 for a hearing on assessment of damages | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Order on assessment of damages entered-the hearing is to be rescheduled in August when the defendant will be available (Agostini, J.). | |
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Plaintiff, Albin S. Rothermel, filed. | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Defendant's emergency motion to reschedule assessment of damages hearing filed. | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice sent to parties rescheduling motion for assessment of damages hearing from 3/7/11 to Wednesday, 3/23/11 at 2:00 pm |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.