Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
M & T Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Braucher, Esq., Matthew R, against Pease, Valerie M, Pease, Thomas B, in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA, . Berkshire County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2012 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationBerkshire County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Berkshire Superior Check #1709 in the amount of $73.40 abandoned to State Treasurer's office. | |
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed (1-88) | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Default (1-88) re: Thomas B Pease and Valerie M. Pease entered. | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event | Escrow received in the amount of 73.40 | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion (P#9) allowed (Daniel A. Ford). Notices mailed 4/14/2011 | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Superior Court Rule 9A list of documents to be filed. | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of filing of motion filed. | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for a hearing filed. | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A. filed. | |
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of law in support of motion to deposit surplus funds with the court and be dismissed from the case, filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.