Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Crooks, Nancy S., filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts Barnstable County Probate and Family Court with Tierney, Hon. Susan Sard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTierney, Hon. Susan Sard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2021 |
CategoryEstates And Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseBarnstable County Probate and Family Court |
Proposed Order/Decree
Date: September 22, 2021Affidavit
Date: September 22, 2021Interested Person(s) , Filed Form MPC 455 to , ,
Date: September 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 04/20/2022 11:06:44 | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Permanent Bond Approved of Personal Representative dated 10/22/2021, by Karen Wehner | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Decree and Order of Formal Probate 10/22/21 | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Issued. Letters of Authority for Personal Representative Sent On: 11/02/2021 13:41:20 | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Assent | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Resulted: Administrative Review scheduled on: 10/22/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Administrative Registry Karen Wehner, Presiding | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Filed; Served as Ordered | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL Will | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Special Personal Representative Judge: Tierney, Hon. Susan Sard | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion For Appointment ALLOWED on 09/23/2021 File Reference # 12 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.