Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citizens Bank, N.A. F K A Rbs Citizens Na, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Hagopian, Esq., Michael R, against Curtis, Albert L, Curtis, James W, Curtis, Joseph G, Estate Of Allan G. Curtis, Lawrence M. Nadzeika As Trustee Of Hilary-Lauren Real Estate Trust, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts with Thomas J. Perrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Perrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Affidavit of Tanya Peters
Date: January 27, 2022Rule 9A list of documents filed.
Date: January 27, 2022ANSWER to original complaint Received from Defendant Tanya Peters
Date: December 03, 2021Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 17, 2021ORIGINAL COMPLAINT FILED by Michael R. Hagopian, Esq. EFILED Envelope # 784376
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for default judgment (#13.1): ALLOWED as to paragraphs 1 thru 4. Counsel to submit proposed judgment. | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Damage Assessment Hearing scheduled on: 03/15/2022 02:30 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Thomas J Perrino, Presiding Appeared: Plaintiff Michael R Hagopian, Esq., Private Counsel Defendant Christopher A Veara, Esq., Private Counsel Staff: Scott W Nickerson, Clerk of Courts
Judge: Perrino, Thomas J |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Notice to appear for Damage Assessment Hearing 3/15/2022 at 2:30pm. Copy mailed to MRH, CAV, JWC, ALC, JGC, TP, | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Hagopian, Esq., Michael R (Attorney) on behalf of Citizens Bank, N.A., f/k/a RBS Citizens, N.A., Successor by Merger to Citizens Bank of Massachusetts (Plaintiff) | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Citizens Bank, N.A., f/k/a RBS Citizens, N.A., Successor by Merger to Citizens Bank of Massachusetts's Memorandum in support of P #13.1 | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Tanya Peters | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Citizens Bank, N.A., f/k/a RBS Citizens, N.A., Successor by Merger to Citizens Bank of Massachusetts's Motion for Default Judgment Applies To: Lawrence M. Nadzeika As Trustee Of Hilary-Lauren Real Estate Trust (Defendant) | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Default 55(a): Defendant Curtis, Albert L and Nadzeika, Lawrence M. trustee: Defaulted by 55(a) request; | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Request to default (#11.0): ALLOWED as to Albert L. Curtis and Lawrence M. Nadzeika, trustee of the Hilary-Lauren Real Estate trust only Judge: Nickerson, Scott W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.