Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tonka Girl, Llc, filed a(n) Equitable Remedies case represented by Farber, Esq., Peter S, against Dennis Conservation Land Trust, Lebel, Douglas W., Macgregor, J. Bruce, Our, Christopher W., Town Line, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Daigle, Esq., Peter M, Jackson, Esq., Travis C, Kwesell, Esq., Amy Elizabeth, Stein, Esq., Robin, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts with Thomas J. Perrino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas J. Perrino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryEquitable Remedies |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
|
Original civil complaint filed.
Date: September 14, 2021Plaintiff Tonka Girl, LLC's Motion to amend the original complaint
Date: November 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to amend the complaint (#19.1): ALLOWED Judge: Perrino, Hon. Thomas J | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing to Amend Complaint scheduled on: 12/22/2022 02:00 PM. Has been: Held as Scheduled. Comments: SWN, 2nd session. FTR. Allowed. Hon. Thomas J Perrino, Presiding
Judge: Perrino, Thomas J |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Hearing on 12/22/2022 at 2:00pm. Copy to PF, Ak, MP, DWL, BJM, CO | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL On this date Michael J Princi, Esq. withdrawn as Private Counsel for Defendant Town Line, LLC | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Tonka Girl, LLC's Motion to amend the original complaint | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Farber, Esq., Peter S (Attorney) on behalf of Tonka Girl, LLC (Plaintiff) | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Rule 9A list of documents filed. | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed for Defendant, Town Line LLC | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Endorsement on motion to strike, to compel (#17.1): DENIED After hearing, DENIED. Defendant Town Line LLC shall create a privilege log of all documents it maintains are subject to the attorney client and work product privileges. Clerk's Notice emailed on 04/15/2022 to Peter S. Farber, Esq., peter.farber@comcast.net; Amy Elizabeth Kwesell, Esq., akwesell@k-plaw.com; Michael J. Princi, Esq., mprinci@princimills | |
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Hearing: Strike scheduled on 04/12/2022: Held - Under advisement Comments: 2nd Session: FTR (CMH) Appeared: Plaintiff - Peter S Farber, Esq. Defendant - Michael J Princi, Esq. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.