Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Donovan, Esq., Michael, against Anderson, Anudra L, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts with Elaine M. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine M. Buckley Track Judgeโs New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryAdministrative Civil Actions |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Affidavit Scott E. McCabe
Date: September 08, 2021ORDER: CONT. 3/11/22 @ 2:00 Judge: Perrino, Hon. Thomas J
Date: February 11, 2022Pre-Trial ORDER: Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M
Date: January 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Agreement for Judgment: Judge: Gildea, Hon. Mark Applies To: Anderson, Anudra L (Defendant); Donovan, Esq., Michael (Attorney) on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Plaintiff) | |
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Conference Status on 9/13/22 at 9:00 am Sent On: 08/03/2022 to MD and ALA | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER: for good cause, pretrial conference continued to 9/13/22, 9:00 for status | |
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Conference to Review Status scheduled on: 07/29/2022 02:00 PM Rescheduled For the following reason: Defendant failed to appear | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 03/14/2022 13:29:41 | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: continued to 7/29/22 at 9:00 a.m. status conf. Judge: Perrino, Hon. Thomas J | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER: CONT. 3/11/22 @ 2:00 Judge: Perrino, Hon. Thomas J | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 02/11/2022 15:57:43 | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 02/11/2022 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. Thomas J Perrino, Presiding Staff: Scott W Nickerson, Clerk of Courts
Judge: Perrino, Thomas J |
|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial ORDER: Judge: Buckley, Hon. Elaine M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.