Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Demelis, Marci, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hughes, Esq., Roland D, Leroy, Esq., Robert K, Rubenstein, Esq., Michael David, against Wilkinson, Christopher R., represented by Welsh, Esq., Brian F, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2021 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs, all appellate rights waived as to Marci Demelis's original complaint | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 03/01/2024 09:00 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Settled Unassigned, Presiding | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE; on this date, Roland D Hughes, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Marci Demelis | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Robert K LeRoy, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Marci Demelis | |
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER with Jury Demand to original complaint Received from Defendant Christopher R. Wilkinson | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Wilkinson, Christopher R.: Service made in hand; 29 Old Town Road, Hyannis, MA 02601 on October 13, 2021 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed with Jury Demand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.