Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vitiello, Steven, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lamanna, Esq., Jennifer M, against Luccio, Jr., Ronald S, represented by Callahan, Esq., Brian Gerard, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: August 16, 2021Answer with a counterclaim and Jury Demand
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation of dismissal with Prejudice, without Costs as to Steven Vitiello's original complaint, counterclaim | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Luccio, Jr., Ronald S: Service accepted by counsel; Brian G. Callahan on 9/17/2021 | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer with a counterclaim and Jury Demand | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint electronically filed with Jury Demand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.