Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Tobin, Kristen E., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Neill, Jr., Esq., John J, against Gentes, Christine C., represented by Mccullough, Esq., Geoffrey B, in the jurisdiction of Barnstable County, MA, . Barnstable County, MA Superior Courts with Gregg J. Pasquale presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregg J. Pasquale Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2020 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBarnstable County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/05/2022 11:30 AM Has been: Not Held For the following reason: Case Disposed Hon. Gregg J Pasquale, Presiding Staff: Scott W Nickerson, Clerk of Courts
Judge: Pasquale, Gregg J |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Party(s) file Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, without costs, all rights of appeal waived. Applies To: O'Neill, Jr., Esq., John J (Attorney) on behalf of Tobin, Kristen E. (Plaintiff); McCullough, Esq., Geoffrey B (Attorney) on behalf of Gentes, Christine C. (Defendant) | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference Sent this date to JJO & GBM by SWN | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance electronically filed, Geoffrey B McCullough, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Christine C. Gentes | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff, Defendant(s) Kristen E. Tobin, Christine C. Gentes's Joint Motion to extend tracking order 120 days (extend Discovery Tracking Order Deadline to 04/27/2021) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion allowed to extend the following deadlines: Discovery to 04/27/2021; amended tracking order mailed to JJO Judge: Manning, Robert Applies To: O'Neill, Jr., Esq., John J (Attorney) on behalf of Tobin, Kristen E. (Plaintiff)
Judge: Robert Applies To: O'Neill, Jr., Esq., John J (Attorney) on behalf of Tobin, Kristen E. (Plaintiff)Manning Robert Applies To: O'Neill Jr. Esq. John J (Attorney) on behalf of Tobin |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH JURY CLAIM Received from Defendant, Christine C. Gentes, by Andrew Callahan | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Service Returned for Defendant Gentes, Christine C.: Service made at last and usual; at 31 Warwick Way, Mashpee, MA 02649 on May 18, 2020 | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. With Jury Demand |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.