Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Luis Enrique Santillan Avelar, Mariana Avelar Villegas, Mark Antony Santillan, Melvin Estuardo Gonzalez Navarijio, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Megan Johnson, against Elias Perez, Elias Perez, As Trustee Of The Elias Perez Revocable Trust, Dated July 25, 2023, Elise Perez, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with Keith Kern Fong presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 15, 2024 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Wrongful Eviction Case) |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference HHJ / Department 517 |
|
August 28, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
April 16, 2024 | Case assigned to Hon. Keith Fong in Department 517 Hayward Hall of Justice | ||
April 16, 2024 | Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2024 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 | ||
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/28/2024 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 517 Event |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. Keith Fong in Department 517 Hayward Hall of Justice Assignment |
|
April 15, 2024 | Notice of Case Assignment | ||
April 15, 2024 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
April 15, 2024 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
April 15, 2024 | Summons on Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.