Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Mennick, Kristian Adam, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Karpilow, Benjamin K., against The Permanente Medical Group, Inc., A California Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Pardo, Oscar A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2024 |
Category36: Unlimited Wrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
NOE of Order re Add-On Case (Mennick)
Date: March 05, 2024SF191612
Date: February 29, 2024Notice of Filing of Request for Coordination
Date: February 22, 2024Plaintiff Kristian Adam Mennick's Summons to Defendant The Permanente Medical Group
Date: January 03, 2024Mennick v. The Permanente Group Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 02, 2024Mennick v. The Permanente Group Notice of Assignment of One Judge
Date: January 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Pardo, Oscar A |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | NOE of Order re Add-On Case (Mennick) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Assigned to JCC Case for Coordination Notice of Entry of Order Coordinating This Matter with Judicial Council Proceedings 5274 |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF REQUEST FOR COORDINATION AS ADD-ON CASE TO JUDICIAL COUNCIL COORDINATION PROCEED JCCP 5274 | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | SF191612 | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Request for Coordination | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Process | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kristian Adam Mennick's Proof of Service of Service of Process on Defendant The Permanente Medical Group | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Kristian Adam Mennick's Summons to Defendant The Permanente Medical Group |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.