We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Performance Property Management Vs. Michelle Armstrong

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

Armstrong, Michelle filed a(n) Failure To Pay Rent case in the jurisdiction of Allegany County. This case was filed in Allegany County Superior Courts Allegany County.

Case Details for v.

Filing Date

July 15, 2022

Category

Failure To Pay Rent

Last Refreshed

July 16, 2022

Filing Location

Allegany County, MD

Filing Court House

Allegany County

Parties for v.

Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Other Parties

Armstrong, Michelle (Tenant / Defendant)

Performance Property Management (Landlord / Plaintiff)

Tippen, Justin (Landlord's Agent)

Case Events for v.

Type Description
Docket Event Supporting Document
Docket Event Complaint / Petition - Landlord Tenant
See all events

Related Content in Allegany County

Case

Robert Alderson, et al. vs. Daniel Willison
Jun 17, 2024 | Getty, J S | Foreclosure - Residential | C-01-CV-24-000231

Case

Joann Condry vs. Sharon Blank
Jun 26, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Declaratory Judgment | C-01-CV-24-000237

Case

Laura O'Sullivan, Esquire, et al. vs. William Beeman, et al.
Jun 14, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Foreclosure - Residential | C-01-CV-24-000230

Case

In the Matter of Wayne Resper
Jul 05, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-01-CV-24-000244

Case

IOSIF TAVOC vs. CLAUDIA TAVOC
Jun 20, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Appeal - District Court Motion | C-01-CV-24-000232

Case

Michael Lefever vs. Robert Liller, Jr.
Jun 12, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Replevin | C-01-CV-24-000249

Case

Minnick Properties vs. Anthony Wright
Jun 14, 2024 | Getty, J S | Appeal - District Court Motion | C-01-CV-24-000228

Case

Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC vs. Aisha Waller
Jun 28, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Declaratory Judgment | C-01-CV-24-000242

Case

In the Matter of Wayne Resper et al.
Jun 27, 2024 | Getty, J S | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-01-CV-24-000240

Case

Andrew Brenner, et al. vs. Margaret Hixenbaugh
Jun 27, 2024 | Getty, J S | Foreclosure - Residential | C-01-CV-24-000241

Case

In the Matter of ROBERT ANDERSON
Jul 05, 2024 | Getty, J S | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-01-CV-24-000245

Case

In the Matter of Kevin Latham
Jun 26, 2024 | Getty, J S | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-01-CV-24-000238

Case

William M. Savage, et al. vs. MICHAEL O'DONNELL
Jun 12, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Foreclosure - Residential | C-01-CV-24-000227

Case

Andrew Brenner, et al. vs. Rheon Baldridge, et al.
Jun 25, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Foreclosure - Residential | C-01-CV-24-000236

Case

Cheri Bennett vs. Randolf Bennett III, et al.
Jul 05, 2024 | Getty, J S | Property - Partition / Sale | C-01-CV-24-000246

Case

Tonya Moomaw vs. Robert Doyle
Jun 20, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Tort - Motor | C-01-CV-24-000233

Case

Valinda Broadwater vs. High Mountain Laundry, Inc.
Jun 25, 2024 | Getty, J S | Tort - Negligence | C-01-CV-24-000235

Case

In the Matter of Robert Anderson
Jun 27, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-01-CV-24-000239

Case

Cheri Bennett vs. Randolf Bennett, III, et al.
Jul 10, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Property - Partition / Sale | C-01-CV-24-000247

Case

Diane Rosenberg, et al. vs. Nancy Leatherman
Jul 02, 2024 | Twigg, Michael O | Foreclosure - Residential | C-01-CV-24-000243

Case

Robert Jackson vs. INMATE GRIEVANCE OFFICE
Jul 10, 2024 | Getty, J S | Mandamus | C-01-CV-24-000248

Case

Laura O'Sullivan, ESQ, et al. vs. Loretta Bullett
Jun 14, 2024 | Getty, J S | Foreclosure - Residential | C-01-CV-24-000229

Case

In Re Estate of Shirley Peskin
Jun 24, 2024 | Getty, J S | Appeal - Orphans Court | C-01-CV-24-000234