Contents

Details Case Events

We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

In The Matter Of John Wright

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Allegany County. This case was filed in Allegany County Superior Courts with Getty, J S presiding.

Case Details for In The Matter Of John Wright

Judge

Getty, J S

Filing Date

June 12, 2019

Category

Appeal - Administrative Agency

Last Refreshed

March 25, 2024

Practice Area

Administrative

Filing Location

Allegany County, MD

Matter Type

Agency Action

Case Events for In The Matter Of John Wright

Type Description
Docket Event Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service
Docket Event Order
Docket Event Returned Paper Filing Status Notice - MDEC Action
Docket Event Supporting Exhibit
Docket Event Motion / Request - To Dismiss
Docket Event Response/Reply
Docket Event Notice to Administrative Agency Issued
Docket Event Order - Waiver of Prepaid Costs Granted
Docket Event Petition
Docket Event Financial Statement
See all events

Related Content in Allegany County

Case

In the Matter of Motor Vehicle Administration
Jul 08, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-04-CV-24-000309

Case

In the Matter of JOSE AGUILAR-MALDONADO
Jul 08, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency - WCC | C-04-CV-24-000308

Case

In the Matter of Roger Hargrave
Jul 05, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-02-CV-24-001720

Case

In the Matter of Luis Sims
Jul 05, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-02-CV-24-001725

Case

In the Matter of Timothy Lehr
Jul 11, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency - WCC | C-02-CV-24-001756

Case

In the Matter of Dakoat Vest
Jul 11, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-02-CV-24-001745

Case

In the Matter of Derronte R Hawkins
Jul 09, 2024 | Hessler, Kevin G | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-15-CV-24-003573

Case

In the Matter of OBIDI HOLDINGS, LLC
Jul 08, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-21-CV-24-000305

Case

In the Matter of Chanoa Moody
Jul 09, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-03-CV-24-002594

Case

In the Matter of Mosi Peters
Jul 09, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-16-CV-24-003196

Case

In the Matter of Shamar Rich
Jul 10, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency | C-17-CV-24-000128

Case

In the Matter of Michael Rector
Jul 09, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency - WCC | C-12-CV-24-000533

Case

In the Matter of The Parking Spot, et al.
Jul 11, 2024 | Appeal - Administrative Agency - WCC | C-02-CV-24-001748

Document

North East Data, Llc, D/B/A Blockfusion v. City Of Niagara Falls
Jul 14, 2018 | Frank Caruso | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | E178915/2023

Document

Claudio Guazzoni De Zanett v. David C Mcfadden AS MAYOR, The Village Of Tuxedo Park, Joshua S Scherer AS TRUSTEE, Tinka Shaw AS DEPUTY MAYOR/TRUSTEE, Christopher Kasker AS TRUSTEE, Paul A Brooke AS TRUSTEE
Feb 05, 2019 | Maria Vazquez-Doles | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | EF004211-2023

Document

DIYA SALAME VS 1ST PRIORITY RESTORATION INC
Nov 02, 2014 | County and Admin Appeals (AP) | County and Admin Appeals (AP) | 2014-000435-AP-01

Document

Stephen Hickey v. Zoning Board Of Appeals Of The Village Of Southampton
Jul 08, 2024 | Christopher Modelewski | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | 616353/2024

Document

Richard Taylor v. St. John'S University, Interim Dean Gina M. Florio, Keaton Wong
Feb 04, 2021 | Michele Titus | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | 702765/2021

Document

LACI NICOLE CARLISLE V. CHRISTOPHER REX WASHAM (E-CASE)
Jul 12, 2024 | CC CS Administrative Order | CC CS Administrative Order | 2431-AD00108

Document

SHARON DAWN RITCHIE VS. DUWAYNE HADLEY HENRY PRATT (E-CASE)
Jul 11, 2024 | PORTER, JILL | CC CS Administrative Order | CC CS Administrative Order | 24PO-AD00013

Document

BOONE CO CHILDRENS DIVISION V DEVIN FORSEE (E-CASE)
Jul 11, 2024 | CC CS Administrative Order | CC CS Administrative Order | 24BA-MC01073

Document

Commonwealth Of Massachusetts vs. Gta Co., Inc. et al
Jul 19, 2021 | Actions Involving the State/Municipality | Administrative Action involving the Commonwealth, Municipality, MBTA, etc. | 2184CV01644

Document

Vithoulkas, Peter vs Helping Hands Senior Services LCC
Nov 09, 2022 | Civil | 90 Day Extension | 22-CA-009414