Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anjolie Tate On Behalf Of The State Of California, And Others Similarly Situated And Aggrieved,, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Zachary Miles Crosner, against Casper Sleep, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2023 |
CategoryCivil Unlimited (Other Employment Complaint Case) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 18, 2023Case assigned to Hon. Brad Seligman in Department 23 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse
Date: 2023-04-21T00:00:00The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex – Case Type
Date: 2023-04-18T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | Initial Case Management Conference | ||
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
The case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex – Case Type Case |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complex Determination Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2023 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 updated: Result Date to 07/18/2023 Result Type to Held Event |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Non-Complex Case |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order re: Complex Determination Hearing Signed and Filed by: Clerk Document |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 20 - Hon. Karin SchwartzReason: Deemed Non-Complex Assignment |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Release of Funds Issued by: Clerk Document |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order (Complex Determination Hearing) Minute Order |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling Published for 07/18/2023 3:00 PM Complex Determination Hearing} Tentative Ruling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.