Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sesloc Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ormonde, Brandon M, against California Department Of Motor Vehicles, Hernandez, Joseph A, represented by Torlak-Celik, Alma, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryLimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty (06) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by SESLOC Federal Credit Union against Joseph A. Hernandez, also known as Jose Hernandez, the California Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV), and Does 1-5. The complaint alleges four causes of action: breach of contract, money ...
Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2023Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (North) Case Management Conference Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment, Filed | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Req Dism Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration/Affidavit Declaration, Filed for Judgment |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
CMStmt Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order 23-00827 Stipulation & Order, Filed re Acceptance of Service and Order Regarding Waiver of Appearance by and of Monetary Recovery Against Defendant California Department of Motor Vehicles |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
pos JH Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service 30 Day Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.