Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ball, James, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kastenek, Anthony C, against Patchen, Lydie, represented by Jalali, Lili, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of California, County of Santa Barbara. It is filed by James Ball, the plaintiff, against Lydie Patchen and Does 1-20, the defendants. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the ...
Ball J - Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 31, 2023Ball J - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum
Date: January 31, 2023Ball J - Summons
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | 83578Reque004ecf | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Ball J - Notice of Settlement - To File | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Ball - Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved As Counsel EXE | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Ball - Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Exe | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 80920Notic005f5a | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | 80490Notic002040 | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment and CMC Hrg (South) Case Management Conference Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 75980CaseM00747a | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
75980CaseMana0051cfe Case Management Statement, Filed |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Ball J - CMS for 5.31.23 CMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.