Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Albarran, Damian, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Melmed, Jonathan, against Amita Restaurant Inc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Rigali, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRigali, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2023 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Employment (15) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
LA495326. CMS
Date: February 28, 202492678CaseM0011b4
Date: February 26, 202470066Compl001a43
Date: January 30, 202370066Civil02274a
Date: January 30, 202370066Summo01931e
Date: January 30, 202370104Civil00dd70
Date: January 31, 202375218Proof00ab5e
Date: May 04, 202376156Proof01efca
Date: May 22, 202376144Plain002cbf
Date: May 22, 202376156Plain00261f
Date: May 22, 2023Complaint, Filed
Date: January 30, 2023Proof of Service, Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: May 04, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Amended Complaint, Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum (Local Form), Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: January 30, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Summons Issued, Filed
Date: January 30, 2023Declaration re: Due Diligence, Filed
Date: March 29, 202376759CaseM00aae0
Date: June 02, 2023Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Notice of Resetting Hearing, Filed
Date: May 31, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 05, 202380173Answe009fce
Date: August 05, 202382621CaseM000c68
Date: September 12, 202382612Plain005f95
Date: September 11, 2023Albarran - Substitution of Attorney (002)
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | LA495326. CMS | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | 92678CaseM0011b4 | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Albarran - Substitution of Attorney (002) | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Rigali, James F |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | 82621CaseM000c68 | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | 82612Plain005f95 | |
August 05, 2023 | Docket Event | 80173Answe009fce | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Resetting Hearing - Zoom Optional Case Management Conference Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 76759CaseM00aae0 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.