We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Brenda Pikitch Vs. Nathaniel Johnson

Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago

Brenda Pikitch, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Robert Dizon Ponce, against Nathaniel Robert Johnson, represented by Austin Lawrence Houvener, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts Superior.

Case Details for Brenda Pikitch v. Nathaniel Robert Johnson

Filing Date

July 10, 2023

Category

Auto Unlimited (22)

Last Refreshed

November 24, 2023

Practice Area

Torts

Filing Location

Monterey County, CA

Matter Type

Automobile

Filing Court House

Superior

Parties for Brenda Pikitch v. Nathaniel Robert Johnson

Plaintiffs

Brenda Pikitch

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Robert Dizon Ponce

Defendants

Nathaniel Robert Johnson

Attorneys for Defendants

Austin Lawrence Houvener

Case Documents for Brenda Pikitch v. Nathaniel Robert Johnson

Pikitch NOS

Date: November 17, 2023

POS.SUMMONS.JOHNSON

Date: July 20, 2023

ATC

Date: August 11, 2023

Case Events for Brenda Pikitch v. Nathaniel Robert Johnson

Type Description
Docket Event Notice: Settlement
Docket Event Pikitch NOS
Docket Event Settlement conference - Ordered
Docket Event Minute Order
Docket Event Statement: Case Management Conference
Docket Event
Docket Event Jury Fee Deposit
Docket Event Notice of Jury Fee Deposit
Docket Event Statement: Case Management Conference
Docket Event Pikitch CMS
See all events