Furchtenicht Sarah, Yuen Chuie-Wei, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mccaffrey Timothy B., against Gk Management Co. Inc., Goldrich & Kest Industries Llc, Goldrich & Kest Industries Llc A California Corporation, represented by Lee Jamie Y., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Moskwith Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Sarah Furchtenicht (Plaintiff); Chuie-Wei Yuen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Sarah Furchtenicht (Plaintiff); Chuie-Wei Yuen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Sarah Furchtenicht (Plaintiff); Chuie-Wei Yuen (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Sarah Furchtenicht (Plaintiff); Chuie-Wei Yuen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: January 30, 2023Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 30, 2023Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: GK Management Co., Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Sarah Furchtenicht (Plaintiff); Chuie-Wei Yuen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.