Levy Jillian Bryce, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Zaman Shawn, against Konig Michael, Rpz La Llc Dba Mainro, represented by Kravetz Dana Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Moskwith Yolanda Orozco presiding.
Case Number(Subscribe to View) Track Case Changes |
JudgeYolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2022 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Management Statement; Filed by: RPZ LA, LLC (Defendant); Michael Konig (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff)
Date: January 30, 2023Case Management Statement; Filed by: Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: RPZ LA, LLC (Defendant); Michael Konig (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-06T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement (By Plaintiff) Filed by Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-10-04T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service (Of Summons) Filed by Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-10-10T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Jillian Bryce Levy (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement (By Defendants) Filed by RPZ LA, LLC (Defendant); Michael Konig (Defendant)
Date: 2023-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-01-30T00:00:00First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.