We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Mara Enterprises, A California Corporation, Vs Sannette Gite, As Trustee Of The Vaughn Family Trust, Et Al.

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago

Mara Enterprises A California Corporation, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Tsylina Victoria V., against Chung Yong Hwa, Jung Hyun Park As Co-Trustee Of The Paulistavivola Living Trust U A Dated February 17 2017, Park Jung Hyun, Sannette Gite As Trustee Of The Vaughn Family Trust, Yong Hwa Chung As Co-Trustee Of The Paulistavivola Living Trust U A Dated February 17 2017, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Yolanda Orozco presiding.

Case Details

Judge

Yolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

January 14, 2022

Category

Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)

Last Refreshed

December 14, 2022

Practice Area

Property

Filing Location

Los Angeles County, CA

Matter Type

Quiet Title

Case Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00

Complaint

Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00

Application for Publication

Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00

Summons (on Complaint)

Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00

Notice of Related Case

Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00

Minute Order ( (Court Order))

Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00

Application for Publication

Date: March 30, 2022

Minute Order ((Court Order) of )

Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00

Summons (on Complaint)

Date: 2022-01-14T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Tentative Ruling Case Number: 22STCV01686 Hearing Date: December 15, 2022 Dept: 31 DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT IS SUSTAINED IN PART; MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED IN PART tentative ruling Since Cross-Compl...
Hearing Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Case Management Conference
Hearing Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Case Management Conference
Docket Event Order for Publication (for Sannette)
Filed by MARA ENTERPRISES, a California Corporation, (Plaintiff)
Docket Event Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Filed by Clerk
Docket Event Application for Publication
Filed by MARA ENTERPRISES, a California Corporation, (Plaintiff)
Docket Event Notice (OF COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Filed by MARA ENTERPRISES, a California Corporation, (Plaintiff)
Docket Event Case Management Statement (by Plaintiff)
Filed by MARA ENTERPRISES, a California Corporation, (Plaintiff)
Docket Event Notice (OF RECORDED NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION RE REAL PROPERTY COMMONLY KNOWN AS 8940 KRAMERWOOD PLACE, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA, 90034 [Code Of Civ. Proc. 405 et seq.])
Filed by MARA ENTERPRISES, a California Corporation, (Plaintiff)
Docket Event Notice of Continuance ((New Date: ))
Filed by MARA ENTERPRISES, a California Corporation, (Plaintiff)
See all events