We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Gabriel F. Herrera Vs Nissan North America, Inc.

Case Last Refreshed: 49 minutes ago

Herrera Gabriel F., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dolin Tionna, against Nissan North America Inc., represented by Rein Elizabeth Chiba, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Yolanda Orozco presiding.

Case Details

Judge

Yolanda Orozco Track Judge’s New Cases

Filing Date

January 04, 2022

Category

Other Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction)

Last Refreshed

February 04, 2023

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Los Angeles County, CA

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Case Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00

Complaint

Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00

Summons (on Complaint)

Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00

Case Events

Type Description
Hearing Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Jury Trial
Hearing Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Final Status Conference
Hearing Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Post-Mediation Status Conference
Hearing Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Post-Mediation Status Conference
Docket Event Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Filed by Clerk
Docket Event Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Hearing On the Court's own motion, Post-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09:00 AM
Tentative Ruling Case Number: 22STCV00242 Hearing Date: November 1, 2022 Dept: 31 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS IS DENIED WITHOIUT PREJUDICE Background On August 95, 2022 Plaintiff George Fuller by...
Tentative Ruling Case Number: 22STCV00242 Hearing Date: October 26, 2022 Dept: 31 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS DENIED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE Background O n January 04, 2022, Plaintiff Gabriel F. Herrera filed a Complai...
Tentative Ruling Case Number: 22STCV00242 Hearing Date: October 25, 2022 Dept: 31 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS DENIED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE Background O n January 04, 2022, Plaintiff Gabriel F. Herrera filed a Complai...
See all events