Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shu Angie Wang Aka Mel Enderson, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElaine Lu Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2022 |
CategoryPetition For Change Of Name (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: May 13, 2022Petition for Change of Name - PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME ANGIE WANG SHU
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: May 13, 2022Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-05-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: GC))
Date: July 12, 2022Decree Changing Name and Order Recognizing Change of Gender and for Issuance of New Birth Certificate
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Request For Copies
Date: July 25, 2022Petition for Change of Name, Recognition of Change of Gender, and Issuance of New Birth Certificate
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Order to Show Cause for Change of Name to Conform to Gender Identity
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: GC) of )
Date: July 12, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.