Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stevens, Lynn M., filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2022 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of petition to administer estate | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition - No Fee | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.