Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Brown, Justin L, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2022 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter Sent to | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition - After Letters Issued | |
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Inventory & Appraisal | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Witry, Traci L. |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Order for probate full/ltd authority (bond?) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.