Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sanders, Brandy, filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection / Opposition to other Petition - GC 70655 | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Duties and liabilities of personal representative | |
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition - No Fee | |
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of petition to administer estate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.