Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jaggard, Melissa filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Calaveras County. This case was filed in Calaveras County Superior Courts with Timothy S. Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy S. Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2022 |
CategoryOther Probate Hearing |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationCalaveras County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation Conference
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing
Judge: Healy, Timothy S. |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection / Opposition to other Petition - GC 70655 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.