Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts with Bigelow, Molly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBigelow, Molly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 02, 2022 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Annual Status Review
Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
February 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 24, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 23, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 21, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 19, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... | |
February 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | GUARDIANSHIP OF VARETTE & DOMERSON RAY Case Number: 22PG-0031522 29. 1:30 PM 22PG-0031522 GUARDIANSHIP OF RAY, ET AL. JUDICIAL OFFICER: BIGELOW, MOLLY HEARING TYPE: FURTHER PROCEEDINGS COMMENT: FOR SE... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.