Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts with Gary G. Gibson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGary G. Gibson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Hearing |
*Motion/Other Hearing
Judge: Stomberg, Nannette J |
|
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 27, 2022 | Hearing |
*Trial: Court
Judge: Ryan, Summer D |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 15, 2022 | Hearing |
DV Temporary Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Gary G |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.