Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Shania Cole, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bevin Allen Pike, against Lane Bryant #6243, Inc., Lane Bryant Brands Opco Llc, Lane Bryant, Inc., represented by Summer Jerre Wynn, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited (15) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Shania Cole against Lane Bryant, Inc., Lane Bryant Brands Opco LLC, Lane Bryant #6243, Inc., and unidentified defendants. The complaint alleges multiple violations of California labor laws. The violat...
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 14, 2022Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Env. 10357036, A notice of removal to federal court has been filed for the defendant. |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings due to Ch 11 Bankruptcy Filing | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Removal to Federal Court | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order: Deeming Case Complex Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/SRK. |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.